DE HB388 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on August 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on August 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill would allow peace officers who have completed a DHSS approved training course to receive, carry, and administer the drug naloxone. Naloxone is a prescription drug which, when administered to a person undergoing an opioid related overdose, can have the effect of counteracting the effects of the overdose. Immunity is provided to officers who administer naloxone in good faith.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Treatment Of Drug Overdose.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-04 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-07-01 | House | Necessary rules are suspended in |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-30 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-30 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2014-06-30 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced in House |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |
2014-06-19 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-19 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2014-06-19 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House |
2014-06-18 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 11 On Its Merits |
2014-06-10 | House | Introduced in House and assigned to Health & Human Development Committee |
2014-06-10 | House | Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |