DE HB385 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Section 7606 of the federal Farm Bill exempts the growth and cultivation of industrial hemp for research purposes from the provisions of the federal Controlled Substances Act, the Safe and Drug-Free Schools and Communities Act, Chapter 81 of Title 41 of the United States Code, and any other Federal law so long as such growth and cultivation is also permitted under state law. This Bill authorizes the growth and cultivation of industrial hemp by the Department of Agriculture and higher education institutions for research purposes in the State of Delaware. Any higher education institution wishing to grow or cultivate industrial hemp in Delaware must be certified by the Department of Agriculture. The Department of Agriculture is authorized to develop such rules, regulations, and standards as are necessary to further the objectives of this Act.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 3 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Industrial Hemp.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-29 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate |
2014-06-25 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-25 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2014-06-25 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House |
2014-06-12 | House | Reported Out of Committee (AGRICULTURE) in House with 1 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits |
2014-06-05 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Agriculture Committee in House |