DE HB384 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act updates the trainee and reciprocity provisions of Delaware’s home inspector licensing act which took effect last year. First, the act protects home inspector trainees from having to pay, or execute a covenant not to compete with, a supervising licensed home inspector in order to become licensed in Delaware. In addition, the Act provides reciprocity for home inspectors licensed in good standing in another State who are members of a national accrediting organization, provided the applicant has practiced for a minimum of one year, performed at least 75 home inspections for compensation and meets all other requirements for licensure by endorsement (including completion of an approved educational course, passage of the National Home Inspector Examination, and proof of liability and errors and omissions insurance).
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Licensure Of Home Inspectors.
Sponsors
Rep. Andria Bennett [D] | Rep. Ronald Gray [R] | Sen. Karen Peterson [D] | Rep. Peter Schwartzkopf [D] |
Rep. John Viola [D] | Sen. Gerald Hocker [R] | Sen. Bryan Townsend [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-06 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (SMALL BUSINESS) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Assigned to Small Business Committee in Senate |
2014-06-24 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-24 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2014-06-24 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House |
2014-06-18 | House | Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 7 On Its Merits |
2014-06-05 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |