DE HB334 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill provides for the transition of the statewide student assessment system, the Delaware Comprehensive Student Assessment (DCAS), to the Smarter Balanced Assessment System (Smarter). Specifically, the bill removes references to multiple assessments.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Related To Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 8 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 8 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 12 YES 9 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Roll Call Rescinded in Senate |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Defeated by Senate. Votes: Defeated 8 YES 13 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate |
2014-06-17 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 30 YES 9 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-04 | House | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 7 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits |
2014-05-08 | House | Introduced in House and assigned to Education Committee |
2014-05-08 | House | Assigned to Education Committee in House |