DE HB289 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill creates equity among users of telecommunications services by extending the 911 fee to prepaid wireless retail transactions.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Enhanced 911 Emergency Reporting System Fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Darryl Scott [D] | Sen. Charles Paradee [D] | Sen. Harris McDowell [D] | Rep. Andria Bennett [D] |
Rep. Deborah Hudson [R] | Rep. Michael Ramone [R] | Sen. Brian Bushweller [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-21 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Assigned to Public Safety Committee in Senate |
2014-04-10 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-04-10 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2014-04-03 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2014-04-02 | House | Reported Out of Committee (TELECOMMUNICATION INTERNET & TECHNOLOGY) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits |
2014-04-01 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Telecommunication Internet & Technology Committee in House |