DE HB280 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-10)
Status: Passed on July 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-10)
Status: Passed on July 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Delaware law enforcement agencies are currently limited to making arrests for cell phone and seatbelt violations to only when the offense occurs in the presence of the police officer. This bill adds these two violations to Title 21, Chapter 7, 701 along with speeding and red light violations as offenses where an arrest is permissible when an observing officer relays the violation information to another officer and is in a position to verify that the appropriate vehicle was stopped.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Arrest Without Warrant For Motor Vehicle Violations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-21 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 2 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Assigned to Public Safety Committee in Senate |
2014-04-08 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-04-02 | House | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 2 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits |
2014-03-25 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |