DE HB275 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on June 5 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-06-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Charter amendment establishes annexation processes for the Town of Frankford to hold annexation referenda and procedures whereby: (1) a petition is filed by all property owners within the territory to be annexed; or (2) a petition is filed by more than half of the property owners.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend The Charter Of The Town Of Frankford Relating To Annexation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-14 - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-05HouseSigned by Governor
2014-05-14SenatePassed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2014-05-07SenateReported Out of Committee (COMMUNITY/COUNTY AFFAIRS) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2014-04-29SenateAssigned to Community/County Affairs Committee in Senate
2014-04-10HousePassed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2014-04-02HouseReported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2014-03-20HouseIntroduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback