DE HB275 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on July 31 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-07-31 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act establishes the Veterans’ Opportunity Credit, which shall be awarded to employers hiring qualified veterans. The credit shall equal 10% of a qualified veteran’s wages, up to a maximum of $1,500. Employers may take the credit in the year the qualified veteran is hired and the two subsequent tax years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 30 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Delaware Tax Credits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-27 - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-07-31 Signed by Governor
2012-06-27 Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2012-06-14 Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2012-06-14 Amendment SA 2 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2012-06-14 Amendment SA 2 - Introduced in Senate
2012-06-14 Amendment SA 1 - Stricken
2012-06-14 Amendment SA 1 - Stricken
2012-06-14 Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate
2012-04-04 Reported Out of Committee (REVENUE & TAXATION) in Senate with 4 Favorable
2012-03-28 Assigned to Revenue & Taxation Committee in Senate
2012-03-27 Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2012-03-21 Reported Out of Committee (VETERANS AFFAIRS) in House with 15 On Its Merits
2012-03-15 Introduced and Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback