DE HB243 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Currently possession actions involving rental of residential or commercial property fall within the exclusive jurisdiction of the Justice of the Peace Court. There is no clear statement of jurisdiction for agricultural leases, though the possession issues are similar. This legislation provides that the Justice of the Peace Court has exclusive jurisdiction over agricultural lease matters and requires that service of process for any such action shall be provided by either personal service or certified mail, return receipt requested.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 25 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Agricultural Leases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |
2014-03-25 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-03-19 | House | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 6 Favorable |
2014-01-30 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |