DE HB233 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill eliminates from Title 25 of the Delaware Code language providing that if the Board of Directors of the Delaware Manufactured Home Relocation Authority does not adopt an adjusted assessment on or before January 31, 2006 then the Board shall eliminate the fees in its entirety. The Authority having complied with the requirement, the sentence is no longer relevant.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 25 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Manufactured Homes And Manufactured Home Communities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (COMMUNITY/COUNTY AFFAIRS) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Assigned to Community/County Affairs Committee in Senate |
2014-03-18 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 34 YES 4 NO 2 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-03-18 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Stricken |
2014-03-13 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2014-01-29 | House | Reported Out of Committee (MANUFACTURED HOUSING) in House with 4 Favorable |
2014-01-28 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Manufactured Housing Committee in House |