DE HB232 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Enrolled on June 11 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-25 - Enact w/o Sign by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 11 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-25 - Enact w/o Sign by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This is the first leg of a constitutional amendment that would expand the list of entities that may certify questions of law to the Delaware Supreme Court to include the highest appellate court of any foreign country and any foreign governmental agency that regulates the issuance or trading of securities.
Title
An Act Proposing An Amendment To Article Iv, 11 Of The Delaware Constitution Relating To Certification Of Questions Of Law To The Supreme Court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-25 | House | Enact w/o Sign by Governor |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (EXECUTIVE) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate |
2014-04-01 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-01-29 | House | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 8 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits |
2014-01-28 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |