DE HB213 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on July 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on July 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill increases the premium tax on surplus lines from 2% to 3%. The proceeds from the increase will be used to fund medical coverage for retired State, County, and Municipal police officers and firefighters. The retirees must be retired from the State Police Pension plan or the County/Municipal Police/Firefighters Pension plan.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Insurance Fees And Taxes To Establish Medical Insurance For Retired State, County, And Municipal Police Officers And Firefighters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-30 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 16 YES 3 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (INSURANCE) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance Committee in Senate |
2014-06-05 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-05 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2014-05-01 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2014-03-19 | House | Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 7 Favorable |
2013-06-27 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |