DE HB208 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill assures that driver’s license addresses and voter registration addresses are the same.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 15 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES/ELECTIONS) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Assigned to Administrative Services/Elections Committee in Senate |
2014-03-20 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-03-19 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 4 On Its Merits |
2013-06-25 | House | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |