DE HB180 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on August 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on August 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act requires all commercial vehicles, except farm vehicles, registered with a gross vehicle weight of 26000 lbs. or over in the State of Delaware to be equipped with an audible reverse warning signal, backup camera or other warning device that adequately places an individual within 50 feet of such vehicle on notice that such commercial vehicle intends to and/or is in the process of reversing.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Commercial Vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-30 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate |
2013-06-26 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 28 YES 10 NO 1 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-26 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2013-06-26 | House | Amendment HA 1 to HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2013-06-26 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2013-06-26 | House | Amendment HA 1 to HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2013-06-19 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2013-06-19 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2013-06-12 | House | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 5 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits |
2013-06-06 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |