DE HB177 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill authorizes the Delaware Thoroughbred Racing Commission to impose a fine for a violation of its regulations up to $10,000 or the amount of the purse for the race in which the violation occurred, whichever is greater. Presently in the Code, that authority is capped at a $5,000, and there is no express relationship to the purse.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 3 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Horse Racing.
Sponsors
Rep. John Viola [D] | Sen. Harris McDowell [D] | Rep. John Atkins [D] | Rep. Quinton Johnson [D] |
Rep. William Outten [R] | Rep. Harold Peterman [R] | Sen. David Wilson [R] | Sen. Ernesto Lopez [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-06-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-24 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-06-30 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (AGRICULTURE) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture Committee in Senate |
2013-06-13 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-12 | House | Reported Out of Committee (AGRICULTURE) in House with 5 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits |
2013-06-05 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Agriculture Committee in House |