DE HB131 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act establishes that gestational carrier arrangements are legal contracts. It establishes a set of consistent standards and procedural safeguards applicable to all agreements for the protection of all parties involved in a gestational carrier arrangement. It recognizes the need for intended parents to obtain legal recognition of their rights before birth of any resulting child especially in cases where medical decisions need to be made immediately after delivery. This Act also expands the jurisdiction over non-residents in circumstances in which significant acts have or are expected to occur within the State.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 13 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Gestational Carrier Agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-06-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-06-30 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-30 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Stricken |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |
2013-06-13 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 30 YES 5 NO 4 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-13 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2013-06-13 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced in House |
2013-06-13 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Defeated in House by Voice Vote |
2013-06-13 | House | Amendment HA 1 defeated |
2013-06-12 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2013-06-05 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 7 On Its Merits |
2013-05-09 | House | Introduced in House and assigned to Health & Human Development Committee |
2013-05-09 | House | Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |