DE HB105 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-03 - Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-03 - Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill provides for election day registration for presidential primary, primary, special, and general elections whereas currently the deadline is the fourth Saturday prior to the date of the election. Moreover, same day registration at polling places will be permitted with submission of valid government issued identification or other generally accepted proof of identification.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 15 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES/ELECTIONS) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Assigned to Administrative Services/Elections Committee in Senate |
2014-04-03 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 24 YES 15 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-04-03 | House | Amendment HA 3 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2014-04-03 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2014-03-27 | House | Amendment HA 3 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2014-03-25 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Stricken |
2014-03-25 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2014-03-25 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2013-05-08 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 3 On Its Merits |
2013-04-30 | House | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |