DE HB1 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-7)
Status: Passed on January 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-7)
Status: Passed on January 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act puts in place a temporary solution to allow for a fraternal or veterans organization with national affiliation or an organization whose membership consists primarily of veterans honorably discharged or active duty service member to operate charitable video lottery machines within their organizations upon approval from the Director of the Lottery. Such activity is only granted until June 30, 2013, at which time this Act sunsets.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Lotteries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-30 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 17 YES 1 NO 3 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate |
2013-01-23 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 34 YES 1 NO 4 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-01-23 | House | Necessary rules are suspended in House |
2013-01-23 | House | Introduced in House |