DC B21-0016 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-20 - Final Reading CC
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-20 - Final Reading CC
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, the bill permits and establishes requirements for surrogacy agreements and other specified collaborative reproduction arrangements. It establishes parental and children's rights between the intended parent and child and clarifies that a surrogate and her spouse or partner do not have any parental rights to the child. It also clarifies that a gamete or embryo donor, or his or her spouse or partner, shall not have any parental rights with respect to the child. It establishes eligibility requirements and procedures for filing a petition for parentage in DC Superior Court. It establishes the requirements for an enforceable surrogacy agreement and the conditions under which such an agreement may be dissolved.
Title
Collaborative Reproduction Amendment Act Of 2015
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-20 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-20 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2016-12-06 | Council | First Reading CC |
2016-11-30 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2016-11-30 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B21-0016 |
2015-01-09 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0016 Published in the DC Register |
2015-01-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-06 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |