CT SB00432 | 2014 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To require the Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection to provide notice by electronic mail to the chief executive officer of a municipality when a registered sexual offender is released into that municipality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Providing Notice To The Chief Executive Officer Of A Municipality Upon The Release Of A Registered Sexual Offender Into Such Municipality.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-07 - Senate Roll Call Vote 449 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - House Roll Call Vote 251 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-03 - Senate Roll Call Vote 295 PASS (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-13SenateSigned by the Governor
2014-05-29SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2014-05-29SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2014-05-22SenatePublic Act 14-213
2014-05-07SenateOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2014-05-07SenateSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2014-05-07SenateSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2014-05-05SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2014-05-05SenateDisagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
2014-05-05SenateTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2014-05-05SenateHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2014-05-05SenateHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5452
2014-05-04SenateHouse Calendar Number 519
2014-05-04SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2014-05-02SenateOn Consent Calendar
2014-05-02SenateSenate Passed
2014-04-28SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2014-04-28SenateNo New File by Committee on Planning and Development
2014-04-28SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2014-04-28SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2014-04-25SenateJoint Favorable
2014-04-22SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
2014-04-16SenateFile Number 575
2014-04-16SenateSenate Calendar Number 387
2014-04-16SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2014-04-16SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2014-04-10SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/14 5:00 PM
2014-04-02SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2014-04-02SenateJoint Favorable
2014-03-07SenatePublic Hearing 03/12
2014-03-06SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback