CT SB00249 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To create a state-administered retirement savings plan for low-income private sector workers.
Title
An Act Promoting Retirement Savings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-29 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3592 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | File Number 276 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 216 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |