CT SB00209 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To ban unsolicited commercial text messages to consumers without prior written consent, to strengthen penalties for violations of the Do Not Call Registry and to educate consumers regarding the filing of complaints.
Title
An Act Prohibiting Unsolicited Commercial Text Messages And Increasing Penalties For Violations Of The Do Not Call Registry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 321 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 223 AS AMENDED (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 144 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 223 AS AMENDED (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 144 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-14 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-14 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-09 | House | Public Act 14-53 |
2014-05-05 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2014-05-05 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-05 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-05 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-03 | House | File Number 757 |
2014-05-03 | House | Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate |
2014-05-02 | House | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2014-05-02 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-02 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-02 | Senate | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4742 |
2014-05-02 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-04-24 | Senate | House Calendar Number 440 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-22 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3684 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-16 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-03-31 | Senate | File Number 191 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 158 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/14 10:00 AM |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |