CT SB00054 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require each local and regional board of education to adopt and implement a policy, or enter into a memorandum of understanding with a law enforcement agency, concerning the use of law enforcement personnel at schools within the district.
Title
An Act Concerning Collaboration Between Boards Of Education And Law Enforcement Personnel.
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | Rep. Jason Rojas [D] | Rep. Kevin Ryan [D] | Rep. Juan Candelaria [D] |
Rep. Michael D'Agostino [D] | Rep. Bruce Morris [D] | Rep. Toni Walker [D] | Rep. Patricia Dillon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-25 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Education |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Education |
2014-04-15 | Senate | File Number 538 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 367 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/24 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |