CT SB00034 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Concerning The Certification Of Household Goods Carriers.
Sponsors
Sen. Donald Williams [D] | Sen. Martin Looney [D] | Rep. Brendan Sharkey [D] | Rep. Joseph Aresimowicz [D] |
Rep. Hilda Santiago [D] | Rep. Noreen Kokoruda [R] | Rep. Diana Urban [D] | Rep. Thomas Vicino [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 280 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 185 PASS (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 185 PASS (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Public Act 14-68 |
2014-05-06 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2014-05-06 | Senate | House Passed |
2014-04-25 | Senate | House Calendar Number 470 |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-24 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-16 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Public Safety and Security |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Safety and Security |
2014-03-31 | Senate | File Number 183 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 167 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/14 10:00 AM |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/28 |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |