CT SB00025 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Establishing The Connecticut Smart Start Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 298 PASS DISAGREEING ACTION (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 231 AS AMENDED (Y: 78 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 203 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 202 ADOPT SENATE AMD E LCO 4388 (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 201 ADOPT SENATE AMD D LCO 4377 (Y: 13 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 200 ADOPT SENATE AMD C LCO 4381 (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 199 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 4380 (Y: 12 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 231 AS AMENDED (Y: 78 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 203 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 202 ADOPT SENATE AMD E LCO 4388 (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 201 ADOPT SENATE AMD D LCO 4377 (Y: 13 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 200 ADOPT SENATE AMD C LCO 4381 (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 199 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 4380 (Y: 12 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-14 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-14 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-08 | House | Public Act 14-41 |
2014-05-03 | House | In Concurrence |
2014-05-03 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-03 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-03 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-03 | House | Rules Suspended |
2014-05-03 | House | File Number 750 |
2014-05-03 | House | Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate |
2014-05-02 | House | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2014-05-02 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-02 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-02 | Senate | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5192 |
2014-05-02 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-04-27 | Senate | House Calendar Number 479 |
2014-04-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule E 4388 |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule D 4377 |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 4381 |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 4380 |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4368 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-24 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-08 | Senate | File Number 417 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 278 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |