CT SB00022 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To prevent fraud in all state-administered programs.
Title
An Act Concerning The Prevention Of Fraud In Government Programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Donald Williams [D] | Sen. Martin Looney [D] | Rep. Brendan Sharkey [D] | Rep. Joseph Aresimowicz [D] |
Rep. Auden Grogins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-25 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-04-17 | Senate | File Number 602 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 394 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/14 5:00 PM |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/14 |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |