CT SB00010 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-15-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-15-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To prohibit insurers from imposing a deductible for certain breast ultrasound screenings.
Title
An Act Concerning Copayments For Breast Ultrasound Screenings And Occupational Therapy Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 286 AS AMENDED (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 258 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 256 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 4678 (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 258 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 256 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 4678 (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Public Act 14-97 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-02 | Senate | House Calendar Number 493 |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-05-01 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4678 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-22 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-03-11 | Senate | File Number 7 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 43 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/10/14 5:00 PM |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/18 |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |