CT HB05578 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To specify the clinical peers for psychiatrists and psychologists, to change references to clinical peers to individuals for purposes of conducting utilization reviews, and to delete references to the Division of Consumer Affairs within the Insurance Department in certain notices provided to covered persons.
Title
An Act Concerning The Health Insurance Grievance Process For Adverse Determinations.
Sponsors
House Insurance and Real Estate Committee | Sen. Joseph Crisco [D] | Rep. Peter Tercyak [D] | Rep. Theresa Conroy [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 294 PASS (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 131 AS AMENDED (Y: 125 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2014-04-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 131 AS AMENDED (Y: 125 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-14 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-14 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-08 | House | Public Act 14-40 |
2014-05-02 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2014-05-02 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-02 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-04-28 | House | File Number 703 |
2014-04-28 | House | Senate Calendar Number 501 |
2014-04-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-25 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-04-25 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4012 |
2014-04-03 | House | File Number 362 |
2014-04-03 | House | House Calendar Number 224 |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-03 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-20 | House | Joint Favorable |
2014-03-14 | House | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2014-03-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |