CT HB05487 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To reduce opioid-related drug overdoses by allowing persons to administer opioid antagonists in certain situations.
Title
An Act Providing Immunity To A Person Who Administers An Opioid Antagonist To Another Person Experiencing An Opioid-related Drug Overdose.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 315 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 102 AS AMENDED (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 102 AS AMENDED (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-14 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-14 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-09 | House | Public Act 14-61 |
2014-05-06 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-05 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2014-05-05 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-04-28 | House | File Number 694 |
2014-04-28 | House | Senate Calendar Number 506 |
2014-04-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-24 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-04-24 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4182 |
2014-04-08 | House | File Number 444 |
2014-04-08 | House | House Calendar Number 260 |
2014-04-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-25 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-24 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-03-07 | House | Public Hearing 03/12 |
2014-03-04 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |