CT HB05395 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-10-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-10-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To protect the best interests of minor children of members of the armed forces by minimizing the disruption caused by deployment.
Title
An Act Concerning Custody Orders For Deployed Members Of The Armed Forces And Confidential Communications Made To Members Of The Armed Forces Who Are Victim Advocates Or Sexual Assault Prevention Coordinators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 368 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 142 AS AMENDED (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 142 AS AMENDED (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-06 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-05-23 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2012-05-18 | Public Act 12-90 | |
2012-05-08 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2012-05-08 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B | |
2012-05-08 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B | |
2012-05-02 | File Number 611 | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Calendar Number 446 | |
2012-05-02 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-30 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B | |
2012-04-30 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 3788 | |
2012-04-30 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3949 | |
2012-04-18 | File Number 505 | |
2012-04-18 | House Calendar Number 381 | |
2012-04-18 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-18 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-12 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-04-02 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-02 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-03-21 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-03-20 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-03-20 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-15 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-13 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Judiciary | |
2012-03-02 | Public Hearing 03/08 | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |