CT HB05392 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1-1)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a program for the collection and disposal of unused pharmaceuticals.
Title
An Act Concerning The Collection And Disposal Of Unwanted Medication.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-03 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-03 | House | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development |
2014-04-02 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-02 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-02 | House | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-01 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development |
2014-03-25 | House | File Number 97 |
2014-03-25 | House | House Calendar Number 75 |
2014-03-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-03-25 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-18 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-13 | House | Joint Favorable |
2014-02-28 | House | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2014-02-26 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |