CT HB05375 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require the superintendent of the technical high school system to collect certain information on both traditional and adult students enrolled in vocational programs and to annually report the same to the General Assembly.
Title
An Act Implementing The Recommendations Of The Legislative Program Review And Investigations Committee On The Reemployment Of Older Workers Concerning The Technical High School System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 316 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 145 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 145 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-14 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-14 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-09 | House | Public Act 14-59 |
2014-05-05 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2014-05-05 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-05 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-04-30 | House | File Number 724 |
2014-04-30 | House | Senate Calendar Number 519 |
2014-04-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-28 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-04-28 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4354 |
2014-04-15 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-15 | House | No New File by Committee on Education |
2014-04-14 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-11 | House | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-08 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Education |
2014-03-31 | House | File Number 209 |
2014-03-31 | House | House Calendar Number 137 |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-03-31 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-24 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/14 10:00 AM |
2014-03-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-13 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-02-27 | House | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2014-02-26 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Program Review and Investigations |