CT HB05325 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To expand home care for eligible elderly residents by removing the program funding cap.
Title
An Act Eliminating The Home-care Cost Cap.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 406 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 85 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 85 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-06 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-22 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-21 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-20 | House | Public Act 14-142 |
2014-05-07 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2014-05-07 | House | Senate Passed |
2014-04-25 | House | Senate Calendar Number 455 |
2014-04-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-23 | House | House Passed |
2014-04-16 | House | File Number 585 |
2014-04-16 | House | House Calendar Number 377 |
2014-04-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-16 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-10 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/14 5:00 PM |
2014-04-02 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-01 | House | Joint Favorable |
2014-03-17 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-03-13 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-11 | House | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations |
2014-02-28 | House | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2014-02-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |