CT HB05305 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-8-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-8-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To restrict the use of cadmium in children's jewelry.
Title
An Act Concerning Cadmium Levels In Children's Jewelry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 422 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 162 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 162 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-06 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-22 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-21 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-20 | House | Public Act 14-140 |
2014-05-07 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2014-05-07 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-07 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-04-30 | House | File Number 720 |
2014-04-30 | House | Senate Calendar Number 517 |
2014-04-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-28 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-04-28 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4488 |
2014-03-26 | House | File Number 141 |
2014-03-26 | House | House Calendar Number 90 |
2014-03-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-03-26 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-20 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-11 | House | Joint Favorable |
2014-02-28 | House | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2014-02-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |