CT HB05147 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-06 - Senate Calendar Number 581
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-06 - Senate Calendar Number 581
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require newborn screening for globoid cell leukodystrophy and cytomegalovirus and to establish a public education program for cytomegalovirus.
Title
An Act Concerning Newborn Screening For Cytomegalovirus And Establishing A Public Education Program For Cytomegalovirus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 256 AS AMENDED (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-06 | House | Senate Calendar Number 581 |
2014-05-06 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-05-05 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2014-05-05 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-05 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5447 |
2014-04-10 | House | File Number 494 |
2014-04-10 | House | House Calendar Number 287 |
2014-04-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-10 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-04 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-25 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-25 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-03-21 | House | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting |
2014-02-24 | House | Public Hearing 02/28 |
2014-02-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |