CT HB05117 | 2012 | General Assembly

Status

Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-10 - File Number 307
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To require the labeling of genetically-engineered foods and to create best practices for GMO farming and preferences for food products that are voluntarily labeled to indicate whether they include genetically-engineered ingredients.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Genetically-engineered Foods.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-10 File Number 307
2012-04-10 House Calendar Number 248
2012-04-10 Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2012-04-10 Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2012-04-02 Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/12 10:00 AM
2012-03-22 Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2012-03-21 Joint Favorable
2012-02-17 Public Hearing 02/22
2012-02-16 Referred to Joint Committee on Environment

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback