CT HB05098 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-21-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-21-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To increase the fine for violations regarding commercially recorded telephone messages that continue after the customer hangs up the receiver.
Title
An Act Concerning The Termination Of "robo" Calls.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 234 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - House Roll Call Vote 36 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - House Roll Call Vote 36 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-12 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-07 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-07 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-05 | House | Public Act 14-14 |
2014-04-30 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2014-04-30 | House | Senate Passed |
2014-04-14 | House | Senate Calendar Number 342 |
2014-04-14 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-10 | House | House Passed |
2014-03-31 | House | File Number 199 |
2014-03-31 | House | House Calendar Number 127 |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-03-31 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-24 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/14 10:00 AM |
2014-03-17 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-13 | House | Joint Favorable |
2014-02-13 | House | Public Hearing 02/18 |
2014-02-11 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |