CT HB05030 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-14 - File Number 524
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-14 - File Number 524
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Making Adjustments To State Expenditures For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2015.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | House | File Number 524 |
2014-04-14 | House | House Calendar Number 330 |
2014-04-14 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-14 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-07 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/14 10:00 AM |
2014-03-28 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-27 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-02-13 | House | Public Hearing 02/24 |
2014-02-07 | House | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2014-02-07 | House | Public Hearing 02/18 |
2014-02-07 | House | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2014-02-07 | House | Public Hearing 02/11 |
2014-02-06 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |