CO SB200 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expand Medicaid Eligibility
Title
Expand Medicaid Eligibility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-200 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-200 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-200 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-200 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-200 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-200 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-200 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | Senate | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Reconsider |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-26 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-25 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-25 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-23 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/12/2013 |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |