CO SB197 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 12 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-04 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 12 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-04 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Transportation Enterprise Transparency Act
Title
Transportation Enterprise Transparency Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-197 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.017 (Attachment A) (Y: 5 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-197 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-197 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-197 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.017 (Attachment A) (Y: 5 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-197 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-197 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-197 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-04 | Senate | Governor Vetoed |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-05-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-05-03 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2014-05-02 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-05-02 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2014-05-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation |