CO SB185 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-05 - House Committee on Education Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-05 - House Committee on Education Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Pay For Success Contracts For Early Childhood Ed
Title
Pay For Success Contracts For Early Childhood Ed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 14-185 indefinitely (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-185 to the Committee on Education (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-185, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-185 to the Committee on Education (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-185, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | House | House Committee on Education Postpone Indefinitely |
2014-04-29 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to Education |
2014-04-23 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |