CO SB174 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prosecution Fellowship Program
Title
Prosecution Fellowship Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-174 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-174, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-174 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-174, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-174, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-174 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-174, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-19 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2014-05-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2014-04-30 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-29 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-04-28 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-24 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2014-04-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |