CO SB015 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Hospitality Career Ed Grant Program
Title
Hospitality Career Ed Grant Program
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Kerr [D] | Rep. David Young [D] | Rep. Jovan Melton [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-015, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.005 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-015 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - move J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-015, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-015, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to amend printed bill, page 5, strike lines 18 and 19 and substitute "established Colorado academic standards." (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-015, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.005 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-015 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - move J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-015, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-015, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to amend printed bill, page 5, strike lines 18 and 19 and substitute "established Colorado academic standards." (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-015, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-05 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2014-04-28 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-25 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-25 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-23 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2014-04-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |