CO HB1389 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-06 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-06 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Sales & Use Tax Exemption For Certain IT Equipment
Title
Sales & Use Tax Exemption For Certain IT Equipment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1389 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 14-1389 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the motion passed on a vote of 3-2. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.018 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1389, as amended, to the Committee on State, Veterans', and MilitaryAffairs (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1389, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment G) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1389, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1389, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 14-1389 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the motion passed on a vote of 3-2. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.018 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1389, as amended, to the Committee on State, Veterans', and MilitaryAffairs (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1389, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment G) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1389, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1389, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology + State, Veterans, & Military Affairs + Finance + Appropriations |
2014-05-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-05-02 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2014-05-02 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-30 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2014-04-29 | House | House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Amended to Finance |
2014-04-23 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development |