CO HB1368 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Transition Youth Dev Disab To Adult Services
Title
Transition Youth Dev Disab To Adult Services
Sponsors
Rep. Jenise May [D] | Rep. Cheri Gerou [R] | Sen. Mary Hodge [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1368 to the Committee of the Whole. Recommend Consent calendar The motion passed on a vote of 7-0. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Reconsider House Bill 14-1368 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1368 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1368 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1368 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1368 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Reconsider House Bill 14-1368 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1368 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1368 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1368 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1368 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-31 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-05-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-14 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2014-04-21 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-17 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-17 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-15 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2014-04-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |