CO HB1352 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Update Waste Tire Management System
Title
Update Waste Tire Management System
Sponsors
Rep. Max Tyler [D] | Sen. Donald Coram [R] | Sen. Nancy Todd [D] | Sen. Steve King [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1352 as amended to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - This is a conceptual amendment. $500,000 general fund for the waste tire fund that was originally for designated in the long bill The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1352, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1352, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1352, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - This is a conceptual amendment. $500,000 general fund for the waste tire fund that was originally for designated in the long bill The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1352, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1352, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1352, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-06 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-05-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-05-20 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-05-06 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation |
2014-04-24 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-23 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2014-04-23 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-17 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2014-04-01 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |