CO HB1334 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Petroleum Cleanup & Redevelopment Fund
Title
Petroleum Cleanup & Redevelopment Fund
Sponsors
Rep. Millie Hamner [D] | Sen. Ray Scott [R] | Sen. Cheri Jahn [D] | Sen. Steve King [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1334 to the Committee of the Whole and the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1334 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1334 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1334 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1334 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-06 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-05-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-14 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-05-05 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2014-05-02 | House | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation |
2014-04-21 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-17 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-17 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-03 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2014-03-21 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |