CO HB1327 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-09 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-09 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Measures Expand Deployment Communication Networks
Title
Measures Expand Deployment Communication Networks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1327, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.022 (Attachment A) to House Bill 14-1327 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1327, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.012 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.016 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1327, as amended, to the Committee on State Affairs (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1327 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 The motion passed without objection (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-04-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 The motion passed without objection (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-04-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1327, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1327, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1327, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.022 (Attachment A) to House Bill 14-1327 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1327, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.012 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.016 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1327, as amended, to the Committee on State Affairs (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1327 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 The motion passed without objection (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-04-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 The motion passed without objection (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-04-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1327, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1327, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-09 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-05-07 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-07 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-05-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-04-30 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology + State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2014-04-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-08 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-08 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-02 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2014-03-25 | House | House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Amended to Finance |
2014-03-19 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development + Finance |