CO HB1284 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-09 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-09 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Legislative License Plate Registration Number
Title
Legislative License Plate Registration Number
Sponsors
Rep. Max Tyler [D] | Sen. Donald Coram [R] | Sen. Nancy Todd [D] | Sen. Larry Crowder [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1284 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1284 to the Committee on The motion passed on a vote of 5-0. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1284 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1284 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1284 to the Committee on The motion passed on a vote of 5-0. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1284 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1284 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-09 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-04-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-04-25 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-04-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation |
2014-03-13 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-12 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-10 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-03-06 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-18 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |