CO HB1260 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Penalties For Sex Offenses Against A Child Under 12
Title
Penalties For Sex Offenses Against A Child Under 12
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1260, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt J.002t The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1260 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - . (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1260 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - . (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1260 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1260, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Substitute motion to refer House Bill 14-1260, as amended, to the Judiciary Committee (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment F) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Substitute motion to refer House Bill 14-1260, as amended, to the Judiciary Committee (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment F) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1260, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt J.002t The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1260 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - . (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1260 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - . (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1260 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1260, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Substitute motion to refer House Bill 14-1260, as amended, to the Judiciary Committee (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment F) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Substitute motion to refer House Bill 14-1260, as amended, to the Judiciary Committee (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment F) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1260, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-05 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-05-12 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-12 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-05-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-04-30 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2014-04-30 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations |
2014-03-18 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-17 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2014-03-14 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-03 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2014-02-03 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs + Appropriations |